THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 04:35:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 34 A Commissioner St
Killarney Health Centre
Killarney Ontario P0M 2A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 287-2300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 20 Sep 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
North Bay Regional Health Centre - Kirkwood Place Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre - Kirkwood Place
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William McMullen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 May 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 34 A Commissioner St
Killarney Health Centre
Killarney Ontario P0M 2A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 287-2300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 20 Sep 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
North Bay Regional Health Centre - Kirkwood Place Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre - Kirkwood Place
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William McMullen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 May 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM JOHN MICHAEL MARY MCMULLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMULLEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM JOHN MICHAEL MARY MCMULLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMULLEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1977

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1976