THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:59:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Occupational Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Community Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Occupational Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Community Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Occupational Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Community Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Occupational Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Community Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 25 Apr 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 20 Mar 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1976
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 1979

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 1978

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1977

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1976