THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 07:37:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1975
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 23 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 23 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1977
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1982

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 1980

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 1978

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 1978

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 1977