THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:43:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 1968
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO, ILOCANO, TAGALOG

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO, ILOCANO, TAGALOG
Medical School: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 24 May 2017
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Milagros Ferreria Saraza to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 24, 2017:

Concerns were identified with respect to Dr. Saraza’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result:

• Dr. Saraza will not provide care or treatment to any individual who is under eighteen (18) years of age.

• Dr. Saraza will not accept any new patients or otherwise provide care or treatment to any individuals other than those patients with whom she had an existing doctor-patient relationship on the date of her undertaking to the College.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 24 May 2017
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Milagros Ferreria Saraza to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 24, 2017:

Concerns were identified with respect to Dr. Saraza’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result:

• Dr. Saraza will not provide care or treatment to any individual who is under eighteen (18) years of age.

• Dr. Saraza will not accept any new patients or otherwise provide care or treatment to any individuals other than those patients with whom she had an existing doctor-patient relationship on the date of her undertaking to the College.

Training

Medical School: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 1968

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jan 2025
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 24 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 25 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1977
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2025

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 24 May 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Quality Assurance Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 1977