THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:55:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical records may contact Dr. Hadipour Jahromi via telephone at: 519-759-6116, or submit a request in writing to the following address: North Woodlands Medical Centre, 40 Shellington Place, Suite 204, Brantford, ON N3S 0C5.
Date Received: 06 Nov 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William Tsuchida Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Jul 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical records may contact Dr. Hadipour Jahromi via telephone at: 519-759-6116, or submit a request in writing to the following address: North Woodlands Medical Centre, 40 Shellington Place, Suite 204, Brantford, ON N3S 0C5.
Date Received: 06 Nov 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William Tsuchida Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Jul 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 16 Jul 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1977

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1976