THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 03:56:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1973
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jan 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gary Taerk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jul 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jan 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gary Taerk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jul 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Jun 1974
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1973
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1977

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 1974

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1973