THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:56:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: [email protected]
416 291 7719
Please contact us to obtain a copy of your medical previous, previous patients.
Date Received: 18 Jun 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rhonda Eisner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Aug 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: [email protected]
416 291 7719
Please contact us to obtain a copy of your medical previous, previous patients.
Date Received: 18 Jun 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rhonda Eisner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Aug 2024

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1976
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1977

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1977

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1976