THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:36:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1966
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 31 Oct 1972
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 1972
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 31 Oct 1972
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 1972
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 11 Feb 2008
Summary of Decision:
On February 11, 2008 the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Freeman committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct unbecoming for a physician.

The Discipline Committee ordered the following:

1. The Discipline Committee directs Dr. Freeman to appear before the Panel to be reprimanded.

2. The Discipline Committee orders Dr. Freeman to pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00 within 60 days of the date of this Order.

3. The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 11, 2008

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 01 Jun 2013
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Joel Bernard Freeman to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”).

I, Dr. Freeman:

• Hereby resign from the College effective June 1, 2013 (the “Effective Date”).

• Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 11 Feb 2008
Summary of Decision:
On February 11, 2008 the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Freeman committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct unbecoming for a physician.

The Discipline Committee ordered the following:

1. The Discipline Committee directs Dr. Freeman to appear before the Panel to be reprimanded.

2. The Discipline Committee orders Dr. Freeman to pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00 within 60 days of the date of this Order.

3. The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 11, 2008

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 01 Jun 2013
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Joel Bernard Freeman to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”).

I, Dr. Freeman:

• Hereby resign from the College effective June 1, 2013 (the “Effective Date”).

• Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1966

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1977
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1977