THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:28:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1978
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
c/o Dr. K. Shirpak
105 - 323 Wilson St E
Ancaster ON L9G 4A8
Date Received: 28 May 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.B. Watters Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Aug 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1978
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
c/o Dr. K. Shirpak
105 - 323 Wilson St E
Ancaster ON L9G 4A8
Date Received: 28 May 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.B. Watters Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Aug 2018

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1977

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1976