THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 06:23:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 1969
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 13 Mar 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 13 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of London, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 13 Mar 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 13 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 27 Mar 2019
Summary of Decision:
On March 27, 2019, on the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission on Liability, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Hardwick committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

AGREED STATEMENT OF FACTS AND ADMISSION ON LIABILITY
Dr. Hardwick received his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice in 1975.On April 11, 2017, during the College’s investigation, Dr. Hardwick resigned his membership in the College. Prior to his resignation, Dr. Hardwick was a general surgeon practising in Stratford, Ontario.

In 2016, Dr. Hardwick’s practice included providing services in the Stratford General Hospital’s Surgical Ambulatory Care outpatient clinic (“SAC”), and surgical assisting in the operating room. The Stratford General Hospital is one hospital in the Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance (“HPHA”).

On July 22, 2016, the College received a mandatory report from the President and CEO of HPHA, about Dr. Hardwick’s behaviour and comments towards Patient A in May and June 2016.

May 2016
Patient A was a teenage student. She developed a pilonidal abscess, located near the tailbone. Patient A attended at the Stratford General Hospital’s SAC on referral from a family physician for an excision by Dr. Hardwick because an earlier excision had not been successful. Patient A was accompanied on this visit by a student coordinator. Dr. Hardwick explained that he was going to open the patient’s abscess to take the pressure off.

When Dr. Hardwick made the incision, he commented on the unusual severity of the infection, including stating that she was a teenager and the smell was worse than he expected. Dr. Hardwick failed to explain that he was making the comment with respect to the severity of her condition. His comment caused the patient distress

June 2016
Patient A returned to the SAC for follow-up with Dr. Hardwick to have her dressings changed, and to have her wound examined to ensure that it was healing properly.
Patient A was accompanied on this appointment by the student coordinator. Throughout this appointment, the patient was lying prone on the examination table with her buttocks exposed. Dr. Hardwick instructed the nurse to remove the bandage residue from the patient’s buttocks.
He made statements purporting to compliment the patient on her physical appearance. He also made inappropriate comments about the standards for cosmetic appearance in her culture, adding that because the patient was from her country of origin, she was probably accustomed to getting compliments on her appearance.
The student coordinator told Dr. Hardwick that it was not appropriate for him to be commenting on the patient’s physical appearance. In response, Dr. Hardwick stated that he was only joking, and said “These government types are so uptight. They don’t know a good joke when they hear one.”
After the June 2016 appointment, Dr. Hardwick telephoned the student coordinator to apologize for how he had acted and for the way he had spoken about the patient. He stated that he thought the patient was mature enough to handle jokes of that nature, and that it was his fault for not recognizing her lack of maturity.

Dr. Hardwick admits these facts, and admits that, based on these facts, he engaged in professional misconduct, in that he engaged in acts or omissions relevant to the practice of medicine that would be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

AGREED STATEMENT OF FACTS ON PENALTY
Dr. Hardwick entered into an undertaking to the College on March 20, 2019, by which he agreed not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction effective March 27, 2019.

DISPOSITION
The Discipline Committee Ordered that:

-Dr. Hardwick attend before the panel to be reprimanded.
-Dr. Hardwick pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within thirty (30) days.
 
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): March 27, 2019 9:00 start

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 27 Mar 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. James Mundy Hardwick to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 27, 2019:

Dr. Hardwick was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Hardwick resigned from the College on April 11, 2017. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Hardwick has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 27 Mar 2019
Summary of Decision:
On March 27, 2019, on the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission on Liability, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Hardwick committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

AGREED STATEMENT OF FACTS AND ADMISSION ON LIABILITY
Dr. Hardwick received his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice in 1975.On April 11, 2017, during the College’s investigation, Dr. Hardwick resigned his membership in the College. Prior to his resignation, Dr. Hardwick was a general surgeon practising in Stratford, Ontario.

In 2016, Dr. Hardwick’s practice included providing services in the Stratford General Hospital’s Surgical Ambulatory Care outpatient clinic (“SAC”), and surgical assisting in the operating room. The Stratford General Hospital is one hospital in the Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance (“HPHA”).

On July 22, 2016, the College received a mandatory report from the President and CEO of HPHA, about Dr. Hardwick’s behaviour and comments towards Patient A in May and June 2016.

May 2016
Patient A was a teenage student. She developed a pilonidal abscess, located near the tailbone. Patient A attended at the Stratford General Hospital’s SAC on referral from a family physician for an excision by Dr. Hardwick because an earlier excision had not been successful. Patient A was accompanied on this visit by a student coordinator. Dr. Hardwick explained that he was going to open the patient’s abscess to take the pressure off.

When Dr. Hardwick made the incision, he commented on the unusual severity of the infection, including stating that she was a teenager and the smell was worse than he expected. Dr. Hardwick failed to explain that he was making the comment with respect to the severity of her condition. His comment caused the patient distress

June 2016
Patient A returned to the SAC for follow-up with Dr. Hardwick to have her dressings changed, and to have her wound examined to ensure that it was healing properly.
Patient A was accompanied on this appointment by the student coordinator. Throughout this appointment, the patient was lying prone on the examination table with her buttocks exposed. Dr. Hardwick instructed the nurse to remove the bandage residue from the patient’s buttocks.
He made statements purporting to compliment the patient on her physical appearance. He also made inappropriate comments about the standards for cosmetic appearance in her culture, adding that because the patient was from her country of origin, she was probably accustomed to getting compliments on her appearance.
The student coordinator told Dr. Hardwick that it was not appropriate for him to be commenting on the patient’s physical appearance. In response, Dr. Hardwick stated that he was only joking, and said “These government types are so uptight. They don’t know a good joke when they hear one.”
After the June 2016 appointment, Dr. Hardwick telephoned the student coordinator to apologize for how he had acted and for the way he had spoken about the patient. He stated that he thought the patient was mature enough to handle jokes of that nature, and that it was his fault for not recognizing her lack of maturity.

Dr. Hardwick admits these facts, and admits that, based on these facts, he engaged in professional misconduct, in that he engaged in acts or omissions relevant to the practice of medicine that would be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

AGREED STATEMENT OF FACTS ON PENALTY
Dr. Hardwick entered into an undertaking to the College on March 20, 2019, by which he agreed not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction effective March 27, 2019.

DISPOSITION
The Discipline Committee Ordered that:

-Dr. Hardwick attend before the panel to be reprimanded.
-Dr. Hardwick pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within thirty (30) days.
 
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): March 27, 2019 9:00 start

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 27 Mar 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. James Mundy Hardwick to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 27, 2019:

Dr. Hardwick was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Hardwick resigned from the College on April 11, 2017. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Hardwick has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 

Training

Medical School: University of London, 1969

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 11 Apr 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1977

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1975