THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:49:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenneth S. Babey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Nov 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenneth S. Babey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Nov 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 22 Sep 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1977

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1976