THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:02:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients please contact above to request a copy of medical records
Jey's Business Record Storage
705.482.1838
Date Received: 15 Feb 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients please contact above to request a copy of medical records
Jey's Business Record Storage
705.482.1838
Date Received: 15 Feb 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
11 Mar 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 11 2025
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from March 11, 2025, the following is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Steven Garry Steinberg in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Steinberg to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)
of
DR. STEVEN GARRY STEINBERG
(“Dr. Steinberg”)
to
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)

A. PREAMBLE

1. In this Undertaking:
“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;
“ICRC” means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;
“NMS” means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;
“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.
2. I, Dr. Steinberg, certificate of registration number 29388, am a member of the College.
3. I, Dr. Steinberg, acknowledge that I entered into an undertaking with the College dated May 29, 2023 (“the May 2023 undertaking”) in which I agreed to undergo remediation and submit to a reassessment of my practice. The reassessment under the May 2023 undertaking was not completed.
4. I, Dr. Steinberg, further acknowledge that once signed, this Undertaking replaces and supersedes the May 2023 undertaking.

B. UNDERTAKING

5. I, Dr. Steinberg, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.
6. Practice Restriction
a. I, Dr. Steinberg, undertake that I will not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the following substances (collectively referred to as “monitored medications”):
i. Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
ii. Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
iii. Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);
iv. Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto as Appendix “A”; and links to the current regulatory lists are attached hereto as Appendix “B”)
v. Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, with a link to the current regulatory list attached hereto as Appendix “C”);
and as amended from time to time, except in the circumstances outlined in (b) below.
For the purposes of this restriction, a new prescription includes the initiation of a patient on a new monitored medication, substitution of another monitored medication for one previously prescribed, a re-start of a monitored medication that was previously prescribed but is not currently prescribed, or an increase in the dosage or frequency of a monitored medication.
b. I, Dr. Steinberg, may renew existing prescriptions for monitored medications for patients to whom I provide care as a locum physician, or while practicing in a similar short-term position approved by the College in its sole discretion.
7. I, Dr. Steinberg, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice, delegate, or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.
8. Posting a Sign
a. I, Dr. Steinberg, undertake that I shall post a sign in all waiting rooms and in each examination and consulting room, in all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, at all times whether or not I am physically present at the Practice Location, in the form set out at Appendix “D”. If providing care in a virtual setting, I shall display the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter. If the patient encounter is by telephone, I shall read the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter. For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows:
IMPORTANT NOTICE
Dr. Steinberg must not issue new prescriptions for any of the following:
• Narcotic Drugs
• Narcotic Preparations
• Controlled Drugs
• Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
• Monitored Drugs

and may only provide renewals of existing prescriptions for the above substances in his position as a locum physician, or while practicing in a similar short-term position approved by the College.

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
b. I, Dr. Steinberg, undertake to post a certified translation in any language in which I provide services, of the sign described in section (8)(a) above, in all waiting rooms and in each examination and consulting room, in all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix “D.”
c. I, Dr. Steinberg, undertake to provide the certified translation described in section (8)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days of executing this Undertaking.
d. I, Dr. Steinberg, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will notify the College prior to providing any such services.
e. I, Dr. Steinberg, undertake to provide to the College the certified translation described in section (8)(b) prior to beginning to provide services in any language described in section (8)(d).

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

9. I, Dr. Steinberg, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
10. I, Dr. Steinberg, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.
11. I, Dr. Steinberg, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
12. I, Dr. Steinberg, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).
13. I, Dr. Steinberg, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal.
14. I, Dr. Steinberg, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.
15. Public Register
a. I, Dr. Steinberg, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
b. I, Dr. Steinberg, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
Dr. Steinberg must not issue new prescriptions for the following substances:
• Narcotic Drugs
• Narcotic Preparations
• Controlled Drugs
• Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
• Monitored Drugs

and may only provide renewals of existing prescriptions for the above substances in his position as a locum physician, or while practising in a similar short-term position approved by the College in its sole discretion.

Dr. Steinberg must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms and each examination and consulting room, in all Practice Locations, which states as follows:
IMPORTANT NOTICE
Dr. Steinberg must not issue new prescriptions for any of the following:
• Narcotic Drugs
• Narcotic Preparations
• Controlled Drugs
• Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
• Monitored Drugs

and may only provide renewals of existing prescriptions for the above substances in his position as a locum physician, or while practising in a similar short-term position approved by the College in its sole discretion.

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca.

D. CONSENT
16. I, Dr. Steinberg, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
17. I, Dr. Steinberg, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS, and any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
18. I, Dr. Steinberg, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix “E” and Appendix “F”, respectively.
19. I, Dr. Steinberg, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from March 11, 2025, the following is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Steven Garry Steinberg in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Steinberg to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)
of
DR. STEVEN GARRY STEINBERG
(“Dr. Steinberg”)
to
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)

A. PREAMBLE

1. In this Undertaking:
“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;
“ICRC” means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;
“NMS” means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;
“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.
2. I, Dr. Steinberg, certificate of registration number 29388, am a member of the College.
3. I, Dr. Steinberg, acknowledge that I entered into an undertaking with the College dated May 29, 2023 (“the May 2023 undertaking”) in which I agreed to undergo remediation and submit to a reassessment of my practice. The reassessment under the May 2023 undertaking was not completed.
4. I, Dr. Steinberg, further acknowledge that once signed, this Undertaking replaces and supersedes the May 2023 undertaking.

B. UNDERTAKING

5. I, Dr. Steinberg, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.
6. Practice Restriction
a. I, Dr. Steinberg, undertake that I will not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the following substances (collectively referred to as “monitored medications”):
i. Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
ii. Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
iii. Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);
iv. Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto as Appendix “A”; and links to the current regulatory lists are attached hereto as Appendix “B”)
v. Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, with a link to the current regulatory list attached hereto as Appendix “C”);
and as amended from time to time, except in the circumstances outlined in (b) below.
For the purposes of this restriction, a new prescription includes the initiation of a patient on a new monitored medication, substitution of another monitored medication for one previously prescribed, a re-start of a monitored medication that was previously prescribed but is not currently prescribed, or an increase in the dosage or frequency of a monitored medication.
b. I, Dr. Steinberg, may renew existing prescriptions for monitored medications for patients to whom I provide care as a locum physician, or while practicing in a similar short-term position approved by the College in its sole discretion.
7. I, Dr. Steinberg, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice, delegate, or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.
8. Posting a Sign
a. I, Dr. Steinberg, undertake that I shall post a sign in all waiting rooms and in each examination and consulting room, in all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, at all times whether or not I am physically present at the Practice Location, in the form set out at Appendix “D”. If providing care in a virtual setting, I shall display the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter. If the patient encounter is by telephone, I shall read the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter. For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows:
IMPORTANT NOTICE
Dr. Steinberg must not issue new prescriptions for any of the following:
• Narcotic Drugs
• Narcotic Preparations
• Controlled Drugs
• Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
• Monitored Drugs

and may only provide renewals of existing prescriptions for the above substances in his position as a locum physician, or while practicing in a similar short-term position approved by the College.

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
b. I, Dr. Steinberg, undertake to post a certified translation in any language in which I provide services, of the sign described in section (8)(a) above, in all waiting rooms and in each examination and consulting room, in all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix “D.”
c. I, Dr. Steinberg, undertake to provide the certified translation described in section (8)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days of executing this Undertaking.
d. I, Dr. Steinberg, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will notify the College prior to providing any such services.
e. I, Dr. Steinberg, undertake to provide to the College the certified translation described in section (8)(b) prior to beginning to provide services in any language described in section (8)(d).

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

9. I, Dr. Steinberg, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
10. I, Dr. Steinberg, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.
11. I, Dr. Steinberg, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
12. I, Dr. Steinberg, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).
13. I, Dr. Steinberg, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal.
14. I, Dr. Steinberg, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.
15. Public Register
a. I, Dr. Steinberg, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
b. I, Dr. Steinberg, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
Dr. Steinberg must not issue new prescriptions for the following substances:
• Narcotic Drugs
• Narcotic Preparations
• Controlled Drugs
• Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
• Monitored Drugs

and may only provide renewals of existing prescriptions for the above substances in his position as a locum physician, or while practising in a similar short-term position approved by the College in its sole discretion.

Dr. Steinberg must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms and each examination and consulting room, in all Practice Locations, which states as follows:
IMPORTANT NOTICE
Dr. Steinberg must not issue new prescriptions for any of the following:
• Narcotic Drugs
• Narcotic Preparations
• Controlled Drugs
• Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
• Monitored Drugs

and may only provide renewals of existing prescriptions for the above substances in his position as a locum physician, or while practising in a similar short-term position approved by the College in its sole discretion.

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca.

D. CONSENT
16. I, Dr. Steinberg, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
17. I, Dr. Steinberg, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS, and any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
18. I, Dr. Steinberg, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix “E” and Appendix “F”, respectively.
19. I, Dr. Steinberg, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 11 Mar 2025
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Steven Garry Steinberg to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 11, 2025.
 
Dr. Steinberg must not issue new prescriptions for the following substances: 
•    Narcotic Drugs 
•    Narcotic Preparations 
•    Controlled Drugs 
•    Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances 
•    Monitored Drugs 
 
and may only provide renewals of existing prescriptions for the above substances in his position as a locum physician, or while practising in a similar short-term position approved by the College in its sole discretion. 
 
Dr. Steinberg must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms and each examination and consulting room, in all Practice Locations, which states as follows: 

IMPORTANT NOTICE 
Dr. Steinberg must not issue new prescriptions for any of the following: 
•    Narcotic Drugs 
•    Narcotic Preparations 
•    Controlled Drugs 
•    Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances 
•    Monitored Drugs 
 
and may only provide renewals of existing prescriptions for the above substances in his position as a locum physician, or while practising in a similar short-term position approved by the College in its sole discretion. 
 
Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca. 
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 11 Mar 2025
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Steven Garry Steinberg to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 11, 2025.
 
Dr. Steinberg must not issue new prescriptions for the following substances: 
•    Narcotic Drugs 
•    Narcotic Preparations 
•    Controlled Drugs 
•    Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances 
•    Monitored Drugs 
 
and may only provide renewals of existing prescriptions for the above substances in his position as a locum physician, or while practising in a similar short-term position approved by the College in its sole discretion. 
 
Dr. Steinberg must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms and each examination and consulting room, in all Practice Locations, which states as follows: 

IMPORTANT NOTICE 
Dr. Steinberg must not issue new prescriptions for any of the following: 
•    Narcotic Drugs 
•    Narcotic Preparations 
•    Controlled Drugs 
•    Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances 
•    Monitored Drugs 
 
and may only provide renewals of existing prescriptions for the above substances in his position as a locum physician, or while practising in a similar short-term position approved by the College in its sole discretion. 
 
Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca. 
 

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2025
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 1997

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1983

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1977

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1977

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1976