THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:56:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 210 Melrose Ave S
The Ottawa Hospital Academic Family Health Team
Ottawa ON K1Y 4K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-761-4334
Fax: 613-761-4200
Address: The Ottawa Hospital (Civic Campus)
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1978
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 210 Melrose Ave S
The Ottawa Hospital Academic Family Health Team
Ottawa ON K1Y 4K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-761-4334
Fax: 613-761-4200
Address: The Ottawa Hospital (Civic Campus)
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1978
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID DAVIDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIDSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID DAVIDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIDSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 1977

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1976