THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:15:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Palacky, 1965
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH, SLOVAK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jan 1976
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking to obtain a copy of their medical record may send a request to [email protected]
Date Received: 08 Jan 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edward Krul Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH, SLOVAK
Medical School: University of Palacky, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jan 1976
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking to obtain a copy of their medical record may send a request to [email protected]
Date Received: 08 Jan 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edward Krul Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2024

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Palacky, 1965

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Member Deceased Effective: 26 Nov 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1977
DETAILS: Expired: Member Deceased
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 1977