THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 05:18:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 531 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 6P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-595-6051
Fax: 905-538-0675

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1978
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M.U. Hack Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 531 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 6P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-595-6051
Fax: 905-538-0675

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1978
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M.U. Hack Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD UNUS HACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HACK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD UNUS HACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HACK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2023
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1977
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 1977