THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:29:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 104 John St
Napanee, ON K7R 1R2
Date Received: 18 Nov 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Hadley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Apr 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 104 John St
Napanee, ON K7R 1R2
Date Received: 18 Nov 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Hadley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Apr 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 11 Feb 2023
Summary:
Dr. Hadley resigned from the College effective November 12, 2020. Commencing in January 2021, a College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Hadley engaged in sexual abuse of a patient. In the face of this investigation, Dr. Hadley has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 11 Feb 2023
Summary:
Dr. Hadley resigned from the College effective November 12, 2020. Commencing in January 2021, a College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Hadley engaged in sexual abuse of a patient. In the face of this investigation, Dr. Hadley has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 13 Nov 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1977
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Dec 1977