THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:27:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1976
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medical Clinic for Person-Centred
Psychotherapy
Unit A201
2040 Sheppard Ave.E,
North York Ontario M2J 5B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 229-2399
Extension: 282
Fax: (416) 229-9771

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medical Clinic for Person-Centred
Psychotherapy
Unit A201
2040 Sheppard Ave.E,
North York Ontario M2J 5B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 229-2399
Extension: 282
Fax: (416) 229-9771

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARRIET DIANNE MCCONNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCONNELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARRIET DIANNE MCCONNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCONNELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 11 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 04 Feb 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1978
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 1983

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 1983

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 1978