THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:55:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1976
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1981
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 275 Bagot St KIngston, ON K7L3G4
Date Received: 02 May 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barbara Parker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Apr 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1981
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 275 Bagot St KIngston, ON K7L3G4
Date Received: 02 May 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barbara Parker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Apr 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 May 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 May 2022


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 1978

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1976