THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:30:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Enahnced Care Clinic
3857 Lakeshore Blvd W
Toronto ON M8W 0A2
Date Received: 30 Nov 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Enahnced Care Clinic
3857 Lakeshore Blvd W
Toronto ON M8W 0A2
Date Received: 30 Nov 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 22 Oct 2021
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Harvey Kelly Knapp to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 22, 2021:

Dr. Knapp resigned from the College effective December 1, 2021 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 
 
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 22 Oct 2021
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Harvey Kelly Knapp to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 22, 2021:

Dr. Knapp resigned from the College effective December 1, 2021 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 
 
 

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Dec 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 22 Oct 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 27 May 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 27 May 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1978

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1977