THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:02:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
Asthma and Airway Centre
Room 7 - 451 East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5499
Fax: (416) 603-3456
Address: Inspiration Research Ltd.
Suite 315
340 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 944-9602
Fax: (416) 944-1513

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 07 Dec 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
Asthma and Airway Centre
Room 7 - 451 East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5499
Fax: (416) 603-3456
Address: Inspiration Research Ltd.
Suite 315
340 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 944-9602
Fax: (416) 944-1513

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 07 Dec 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH ROSS CHAPMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAPMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH ROSS CHAPMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAPMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1978

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1977