THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:40:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Geoffrey Davis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Dec 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Geoffrey Davis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Dec 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 19 Oct 2017
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Geoffrey Brian Davis to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 19, 2017:

The College received information from the Narcotics Monitoring System about Dr. Davis’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Based on the information received, the College conducted an investigation into whether Dr. Davis failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Davis will not take on any new patients with chronic non-cancer pain, with the exception of new patients whose care he assumes for the purpose of providing palliative care.

Dr. Davis’s prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, and
other monitored drugs will be supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for minimum of nine (9) months.

Dr. Davis will engage in professional education in the prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Following the professional education and period of supervision, Dr. Davis’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by an assessor selected by the College.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 19 Oct 2017
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Geoffrey Brian Davis to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 19, 2017:

The College received information from the Narcotics Monitoring System about Dr. Davis’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Based on the information received, the College conducted an investigation into whether Dr. Davis failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Davis will not take on any new patients with chronic non-cancer pain, with the exception of new patients whose care he assumes for the purpose of providing palliative care.

Dr. Davis’s prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, and
other monitored drugs will be supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for minimum of nine (9) months.

Dr. Davis will engage in professional education in the prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Following the professional education and period of supervision, Dr. Davis’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by an assessor selected by the College.

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Sep 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1978
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1978