THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:00:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: Apostolopoulos, Athanassios (Used Until: 17 Feb 1999)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 17 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.T. Apostol Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jun 2017

General Information

Former Name: Apostolopoulos, Athanassios (Used Until: 17 Feb 1999)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 17 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.T. Apostol Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jun 2017

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1978

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1977