THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:37:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: Stone, Susan Van Steenburgh (Used Until: 11 May 2010)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Inner City Health Associates
145 Front St E
Toronto ON M5A 1E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-591-4411
Fax: 416-640-2072

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1978
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Stone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Stone (CPSO#: 30184 )

General Information

Former Name: Stone, Susan Van Steenburgh (Used Until: 11 May 2010)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Inner City Health Associates
145 Front St E
Toronto ON M5A 1E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-591-4411
Fax: 416-640-2072

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1978
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Stone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Stone (CPSO#: 30184 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN STONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STONE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN STONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STONE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1978

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1976