THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:47:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: RSRS https://www.recordsolutions.ca

Date Received: 14 Dec 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: RSRS https://www.recordsolutions.ca

Date Received: 14 Dec 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 04 Nov 2022
Summary of Decision:
On November 4, 2022, the Tribunal found that Dr. Rona failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care and treatment of Patient A and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in relation to his communications about the COVID-19 pandemic and related issues.

The Tribunal ordered that:
 
1. Dr. Rona attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
2. Dr. Rona pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by December 5, 2022.
 
Dr. Rona also entered into an undertaking in which he agreed to resign from the College and not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction, effective immediately.
 
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2022-11-04

Other Notifications (4)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 28 Oct 2022
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Zoltan Peter Rona to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 28, 2022:
 
Dr. Rona was referred to the Discipline Tribunal on allegations of professional misconduct. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Rona resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
 


Source: Member
Effective Date: 02 Jun 2022
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr Zoltan Peter Rona to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 2, 2022:   
 
Dr. Rona is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal into allegations that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in relation to his care and treatment of a patient and that he incompetent. As a result of the referral:

Dr. Rona must practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 21 Apr 2021
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 17 Aug 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 04 Nov 2022
Summary of Decision:
On November 4, 2022, the Tribunal found that Dr. Rona failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care and treatment of Patient A and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in relation to his communications about the COVID-19 pandemic and related issues.

The Tribunal ordered that:
 
1. Dr. Rona attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
2. Dr. Rona pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by December 5, 2022.
 
Dr. Rona also entered into an undertaking in which he agreed to resign from the College and not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction, effective immediately.
 
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2022-11-04

Other Notifications (4)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 28 Oct 2022
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Zoltan Peter Rona to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 28, 2022:
 
Dr. Rona was referred to the Discipline Tribunal on allegations of professional misconduct. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Rona resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
 


Source: Member
Effective Date: 02 Jun 2022
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr Zoltan Peter Rona to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 2, 2022:   
 
Dr. Rona is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal into allegations that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in relation to his care and treatment of a patient and that he incompetent. As a result of the referral:

Dr. Rona must practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 21 Apr 2021
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 17 Aug 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 04 Nov 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Jun 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1977
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 1978

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1978

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1977