THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:59:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ESTONIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1978
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arvo Kuld Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ESTONIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1978
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arvo Kuld Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 08 Jul 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1978

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 1978