THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:47:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 17 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Howard M. Clarke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Nov 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 17 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Howard M. Clarke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Nov 2016

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1978
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1985

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 1978