THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:40:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Real Estate Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Real Estate
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Real Estate Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Real Estate
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Executive Committee
16 Oct 2008
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Executive Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 16 2008
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from 11:59 p.m., October 16, 2008, by order of the Discipline Committee of
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
by Dr. Arun Kumar Jain:

(i) Dr. Jain will complete a training program acceptable to the College
in the field of surgical assisting with a surgeon certified by the
Royal College of Surgeons working in a hospital setting and
acceptable to the College (the "Surgical Assist Supervisor").

(ii) The Surgical Assist Supervisor will execute an Undertaking to the
College and will provide monthly reports to the College regarding
Dr. Jain's progress in the training program.

(iii) Dr. Jain will participate in the training program until deemed
competent in the field of surgical assisting by the Surgical Assist
Supervisor, but in any event for a period of no less than three
months.

(iv) While participating in the training program, Dr. Jain will not be
the most responsible physician for any patients and will not
provide any continuity of care to any patients including any pre or
post-operative care.

(v) The costs of the training program will be borne by Dr. Jain.

(vi) Following completion of the training program, Dr. Jain may practise
medicine as a surgical assistant only and on the following terms:

(a) Dr. Jain may practise as a surgical assist in a hospital
based setting and when a College approved certified surgeon
who is a member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of
Ontario is performing the surgery and in attendance;
(b) Dr. Jain will not be the most responsible physician for any
patients and shall not provide any continuity of care to any
patients including any pre- or post-operative care.

(vii) Dr. Jain will cooperate with unannounced inspections of his
practice by College representatives for the purpose of monitoring
and enforcing compliance with the terms of this Order;

(viii) Dr. Jain is prohibited from prescribing all medications, including,
without limitation, those set out in the Summary of Narcotics,
Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs and
Benzodiazepines/Targeted Substances taken from the Compendium of
Pharmaceuticals and Specialties (Health Canada) and Schedules I
through IV of the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C. 1996,
c.19, attached as Schedule "A" to the order.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from 11:59 p.m., October 16, 2008, by order of the Discipline Committee of
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
by Dr. Arun Kumar Jain:

(i) Dr. Jain will complete a training program acceptable to the College
in the field of surgical assisting with a surgeon certified by the
Royal College of Surgeons working in a hospital setting and
acceptable to the College (the "Surgical Assist Supervisor").

(ii) The Surgical Assist Supervisor will execute an Undertaking to the
College and will provide monthly reports to the College regarding
Dr. Jain's progress in the training program.

(iii) Dr. Jain will participate in the training program until deemed
competent in the field of surgical assisting by the Surgical Assist
Supervisor, but in any event for a period of no less than three
months.

(iv) While participating in the training program, Dr. Jain will not be
the most responsible physician for any patients and will not
provide any continuity of care to any patients including any pre or
post-operative care.

(v) The costs of the training program will be borne by Dr. Jain.

(vi) Following completion of the training program, Dr. Jain may practise
medicine as a surgical assistant only and on the following terms:

(a) Dr. Jain may practise as a surgical assist in a hospital
based setting and when a College approved certified surgeon
who is a member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of
Ontario is performing the surgery and in attendance;
(b) Dr. Jain will not be the most responsible physician for any
patients and shall not provide any continuity of care to any
patients including any pre- or post-operative care.

(vii) Dr. Jain will cooperate with unannounced inspections of his
practice by College representatives for the purpose of monitoring
and enforcing compliance with the terms of this Order;

(viii) Dr. Jain is prohibited from prescribing all medications, including,
without limitation, those set out in the Summary of Narcotics,
Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs and
Benzodiazepines/Targeted Substances taken from the Compendium of
Pharmaceuticals and Specialties (Health Canada) and Schedules I
through IV of the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C. 1996,
c.19, attached as Schedule "A" to the order.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 11 Mar 1999
Summary of Decision:
On March 11, 1999, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Jain s plea of guilty to professional misconduct as defined in Ontario Regulation 856/93, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 1(1)(2); in that he contravened the Medicine Act, 1991, the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, or the regulations under either of those Acts, contrary to s. 1(1)(27); in that he contravened a federal, provincial or territorial law, a municipal by-law or a by-law or rule of a public hospital if (i) the purpose of the law, by-law or rule is to protect public health, or (ii) the contravention is relevant to his suitability to practice, contrary to s. 1(1)(28);and in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 1(1)(33). The Committee also accepted Dr. Jain s plea of guilty to the charge of incompetence, as defined in s. 52(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, as amended, in that his professional care of a patient displayed a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of the patient of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates that he is unfit to continue to practice or that his practice should be restricted.

The Committee ordered Dr. Jain s certificate of registration be revoked.

On October 16, 2008, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario directed the Registrar to reinstate Dr. Arun Kumar Jain's certificate of registration and to impose the following terms, conditions, and limitations on Dr. Jain's certificate of registration:

(i) Dr. Jain will complete a training program acceptable to the College in the field of surgical assisting with a surgeon certified by the Royal College of Surgeons working in a hospital setting and acceptable to the College (the "Surgical Assist Supervisor").

(ii) The Surgical Assist Supervisor will execute an Undertaking to the College and will provide monthly reports to the College regarding Dr. Jain's progress in the training program.

(iii) Dr. Jain will participate in the training program until deemed competent in the field of surgical assisting by the Surgical Assist Supervisor, but in any event for a period of no less than three months.

(iv) While participating in the training program, Dr. Jain will not be the most responsible physician for any patients and will not provide any continuity of care to any patients including any pre or post-operative care.

(v) The costs of the training program will be borne by Dr. Jain.

(vi) Following completion of the training program, Dr. Jain may practice medicine as a surgical assistant only and on the following terms:

(a) Dr. Jain may practice as a surgical assist in a hospital based setting and when a College approved certified surgeon who is a member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario is performing the surgery
and in attendance;
(b) Dr. Jain will not be the most responsible physician for any patients and shall not provide any continuity of care to any patients including any pre- or post-operative care.

(vii) Dr. Jain will cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice by College representatives for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing compliance with the terms of this Order;

(viii) Dr. Jain is prohibited from prescribing all medications, including, without limitation, those set out in the Summary of Narcotics, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs and Benzodiazepines/Targeted Substances taken from the Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties (Health Canada) and Schedules I through IV of the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C. 1996, c.19, attached as Schedule "A" to the order.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 10, 1999
    Application for Reinstatement: Download Reinstatement Decision (PDF)
    Decision Date: 16 Oct 2008
    Decision: Application Accepted

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 11 Mar 1999
Summary of Decision:
On March 11, 1999, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Jain s plea of guilty to professional misconduct as defined in Ontario Regulation 856/93, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 1(1)(2); in that he contravened the Medicine Act, 1991, the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, or the regulations under either of those Acts, contrary to s. 1(1)(27); in that he contravened a federal, provincial or territorial law, a municipal by-law or a by-law or rule of a public hospital if (i) the purpose of the law, by-law or rule is to protect public health, or (ii) the contravention is relevant to his suitability to practice, contrary to s. 1(1)(28);and in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 1(1)(33). The Committee also accepted Dr. Jain s plea of guilty to the charge of incompetence, as defined in s. 52(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, as amended, in that his professional care of a patient displayed a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of the patient of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates that he is unfit to continue to practice or that his practice should be restricted.

The Committee ordered Dr. Jain s certificate of registration be revoked.

On October 16, 2008, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario directed the Registrar to reinstate Dr. Arun Kumar Jain's certificate of registration and to impose the following terms, conditions, and limitations on Dr. Jain's certificate of registration:

(i) Dr. Jain will complete a training program acceptable to the College in the field of surgical assisting with a surgeon certified by the Royal College of Surgeons working in a hospital setting and acceptable to the College (the "Surgical Assist Supervisor").

(ii) The Surgical Assist Supervisor will execute an Undertaking to the College and will provide monthly reports to the College regarding Dr. Jain's progress in the training program.

(iii) Dr. Jain will participate in the training program until deemed competent in the field of surgical assisting by the Surgical Assist Supervisor, but in any event for a period of no less than three months.

(iv) While participating in the training program, Dr. Jain will not be the most responsible physician for any patients and will not provide any continuity of care to any patients including any pre or post-operative care.

(v) The costs of the training program will be borne by Dr. Jain.

(vi) Following completion of the training program, Dr. Jain may practice medicine as a surgical assistant only and on the following terms:

(a) Dr. Jain may practice as a surgical assist in a hospital based setting and when a College approved certified surgeon who is a member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario is performing the surgery
and in attendance;
(b) Dr. Jain will not be the most responsible physician for any patients and shall not provide any continuity of care to any patients including any pre- or post-operative care.

(vii) Dr. Jain will cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice by College representatives for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing compliance with the terms of this Order;

(viii) Dr. Jain is prohibited from prescribing all medications, including, without limitation, those set out in the Summary of Narcotics, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs and Benzodiazepines/Targeted Substances taken from the Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties (Health Canada) and Schedules I through IV of the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C. 1996, c.19, attached as Schedule "A" to the order.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 10, 1999
    Application for Reinstatement: Download Reinstatement Decision (PDF)
    Decision Date: 16 Oct 2008
    Decision: Application Accepted

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2008
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 19 Aug 1999
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 31 Mar 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 21 Nov 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1978
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Executive Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2008

DETAILS: Revoked: Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 1999

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 1996

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 May 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 1978