THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:50:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 31 May 2018
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Lorin Gilbert Harding to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 31, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Harding failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his infection control practices. During the investigation, Dr. Harding resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 31 May 2018
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Lorin Gilbert Harding to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 31, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Harding failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his infection control practices. During the investigation, Dr. Harding resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 May 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 08 May 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 May 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 08 May 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 1978

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1977