THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:53:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Madras, 1970
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 34 Kimberwick Crescent
Ottawa Ontario K1V 0W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-4801
Fax: (613) 737-9294

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking to obtain a copy of their medical record can contact: 613-737-4801.
Date Received: 16 Dec 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Madras, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 34 Kimberwick Crescent
Ottawa Ontario K1V 0W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-4801
Fax: (613) 737-9294

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking to obtain a copy of their medical record can contact: 613-737-4801.
Date Received: 16 Dec 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIOLET GONSALVES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GONSALVES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIOLET GONSALVES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GONSALVES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Madras, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 1978

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1975