THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:34:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 1970
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of London, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 24 Aug 2021
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Michael John Mullan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 24, 2021:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Mullan’s knowledge, skill and judgment. Dr. Mullan has ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services. 
 
 
 
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 24 Aug 2021
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Michael John Mullan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 24, 2021:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Mullan’s knowledge, skill and judgment. Dr. Mullan has ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services. 
 
 
 
 

Training

Medical School: University of London, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 24 Aug 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1978
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 1978