THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 13:26:17 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 1965
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 29 Nov 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN
Medical School: Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 29 Nov 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 1965

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1975
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1972
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 1978

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1977

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1976

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1975

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 1972