THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:31:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1977
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 1508
77 St Clair Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4T 1M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 960-8775
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jan 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martha Wright Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Mar 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 1508
77 St Clair Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4T 1M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 960-8775
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jan 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martha Wright Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Mar 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTHA ELIZABETH WRIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WRIGHT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTHA ELIZABETH WRIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WRIGHT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 1978

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1977