THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:16:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 407
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville Ontario L6H 3P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 338-3130
Fax: (905) 338-3150

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 24 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 407
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville Ontario L6H 3P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 338-3130
Fax: (905) 338-3150

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 24 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD WILLIAM CASEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD WILLIAM CASEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 15 Aug 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 1983

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 1982

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 1978

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 1978

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1977