THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:03:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: c/o Dr. Chung Dao
700 Main Street East
Hamilton ON L8M 1K7
Date Received: 13 Apr 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Henderson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Aug 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: c/o Dr. Chung Dao
700 Main Street East
Hamilton ON L8M 1K7
Date Received: 13 Apr 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Henderson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Aug 2016

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 1978
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2019


DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 1978