THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:15:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 06 Dec 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Electronic Medical Records
Middlesex Centre
Family Medical Clinic
36 Heritage Drive
Ilderton Ontario N0M 2A0
Date Received: 10 Nov 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John M. Howard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Feb 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 06 Dec 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Electronic Medical Records
Middlesex Centre
Family Medical Clinic
36 Heritage Drive
Ilderton Ontario N0M 2A0
Date Received: 10 Nov 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John M. Howard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Feb 2018

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Nov 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 20 Jun 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1978
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2017


DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 1978