THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:03:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1976
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 25 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 18 Nov 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 25 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 18 Nov 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 1978

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1976