THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:55:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1975
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2016


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Dec 1978

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1975