THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:02:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1209-170 Avenue Rd
Toronto ON M5R 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 14165678141
Fax: none

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 15 Nov 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1209-170 Avenue Rd
Toronto ON M5R 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 14165678141
Fax: none

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 15 Nov 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL STEPHEN ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL STEPHEN ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 03 Apr 1984
Summary of Decision:
In April 1984, Dr. Ross pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21). Dr. Ross also pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Discipline Committee accepted these pleas and found Dr. Ross guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Ross' licence to practice be suspended for a period of two months. The Committee also ruled that for a period of thirty months conditions be placed on Dr. Ross' licence, such that all new female potential patients under the age of thirty years would be discussed with, and approved by, a specialist psychiatrist who would in turn report to the Registrar at six-monthly intervals indicating an acceptable standard of patient care. During this period, Dr. Ross was also to waive his right of confidentiality with his psychoanalyst, and direct him to submit a report to the Registrar at intervals of six months, outlining his progress in therapy. Failure to meet these conditions would result in revocation of licence. The Committee further ordered that these penalties be recorded on the Register, and recommended that the Doctor's name be published.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 02 Apr 1984

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 03 Apr 1984
Summary of Decision:
In April 1984, Dr. Ross pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21). Dr. Ross also pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Discipline Committee accepted these pleas and found Dr. Ross guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Ross' licence to practice be suspended for a period of two months. The Committee also ruled that for a period of thirty months conditions be placed on Dr. Ross' licence, such that all new female potential patients under the age of thirty years would be discussed with, and approved by, a specialist psychiatrist who would in turn report to the Registrar at six-monthly intervals indicating an acceptable standard of patient care. During this period, Dr. Ross was also to waive his right of confidentiality with his psychoanalyst, and direct him to submit a report to the Registrar at intervals of six months, outlining his progress in therapy. Failure to meet these conditions would result in revocation of licence. The Committee further ordered that these penalties be recorded on the Register, and recommended that the Doctor's name be published.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 02 Apr 1984

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 14 Sep 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 1984


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 1978

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1978

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1974