THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:13:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6 Union Street
Natick Massachusetts 01760
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (508) 655-5115
Fax: (508) 650-9351

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 13 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6 Union Street
Natick Massachusetts 01760
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (508) 655-5115
Fax: (508) 650-9351

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 13 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL GERALD KENNEDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENNEDY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL GERALD KENNEDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENNEDY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 13 Dec 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 1982

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1974