THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:02:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 20 May 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 20 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Vezina Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Dec 2017

Corporation Name: Dr. Claude Vezina Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jul 2013

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 20 May 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 20 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Vezina Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Dec 2017

Corporation Name: Dr. Claude Vezina Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jul 2013

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 22 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 May 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1977