THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:20:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 27 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 17 Nov 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Command Services (London) Limited
100 Piccadilly Street
London, Ontario
N6A 1R8
Date Received: 16 Apr 2009

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenneth Harris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Oct 2012

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 27 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 17 Nov 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Command Services (London) Limited
100 Piccadilly Street
London, Ontario
N6A 1R8
Date Received: 16 Apr 2009

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenneth Harris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Oct 2012

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2023


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1977