THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:21:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Kincardine Family Health Team, 44 Queen Street, Kincardine, Ontario
N2Z 3C2 Tel: (519) 396-2700
Date Received: 17 Dec 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael J Emond Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Apr 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Kincardine Family Health Team, 44 Queen Street, Kincardine, Ontario
N2Z 3C2 Tel: (519) 396-2700
Date Received: 17 Dec 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael J Emond Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Apr 2019

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
No information available

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 26 Dec 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1978
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 26 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1978