THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:31:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rotman Research Institute
Baycrest Health Sciences
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416)785 2500
Extension: 2734
Fax: (416)7854256
Address: Hawkesbury General Hospital
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3G5
Phone: (613) 632-1111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 18 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rotman Research Institute
Baycrest Health Sciences
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416)785 2500
Extension: 2734
Fax: (416)7854256
Address: Hawkesbury General Hospital
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3G5
Phone: (613) 632-1111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 18 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOWARD MARK CHERTKOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHERTKOW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOWARD MARK CHERTKOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHERTKOW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 1986

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1982

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 1980

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1978