THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:55:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Punjab University India, 1969
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. K. Buttar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Feb 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Punjab University India, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. K. Buttar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Feb 2019

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 19 Nov 2018
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Kulwant Kaur Buttar to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 19, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Buttar failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. During the Investigation, Dr. Buttar resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 19 Nov 2018
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Kulwant Kaur Buttar to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 19, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Buttar failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. During the Investigation, Dr. Buttar resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario. 

Training

Medical School: Punjab University India, 1969

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 19 Nov 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1972
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 1972