THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:13:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Far Eastern University, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients are asked to call 416-928-1197 to make arrangements for records pick up.
33 Howard St
Toronto ON M4X 1J6
Date Received: 27 Mar 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO
Medical School: Far Eastern University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients are asked to call 416-928-1197 to make arrangements for records pick up.
33 Howard St
Toronto ON M4X 1J6
Date Received: 27 Mar 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 10 Aug 2010
Summary of Decision:
On August 10, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Portugal has committed an act of professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 1991, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Between June 2007 and June 2009, a patient, through her authorized representative, sent approximately thirteen requests to Dr. Portugal requesting copies of all of his clinical notes and records from 2002 to present. Despite receiving these requests, Dr. Portugal failed to provide Patient A's clinical notes and records to the patient or her authorized representative.

Dr. Portugal stated that the delay in response to the patient s request was as a result of failures by his office to either respond to the requests or bring them to his attention and he has instituted changes in order to avoid similar problems in the future.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. The Registrar suspend Dr. Portugal's certificate of registration for a period of one month, which suspension shall itself be suspended if, within two months of the date of this Order:

i. Dr. Portugal retains the services of a third party organization/efficiency expert (the "TPO") to evaluate his current administrative practices;

ii. Dr. Portugal implements all reasonable recommendations made by the TPO regarding the management and day to day administration of his practice; and

iii. Dr. Portugal provides a letter from the TPO confirming that all reasonable recommendations have been implemented.

2. The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Portugal's certificate of registration:

(a) Dr. Portugal shall provide a report from the TPO twelve months after he implements all of their recommendations, confirming that his organization system remains working and that his practice is running efficiently; and

(b) Dr. Portugal shall successfully complete, at his own expense, the College's Medical Ethics and Informed Consent Course within twelve months of the date of this Order.

3. The terms, conditions and limitations in paragraph 2 herein shall be removed by the College after it receives confirmation that those terms, conditions and limitations have been fulfilled.

4. Dr. Portugal appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

5. Dr. Portugal pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650 within 30 days of the date of this Order.

6. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): August 10, 2010

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 18 Feb 2016
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Francisco Suyat Portugal to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 18, 2016:

An investigation into Dr. Portugal’s practice revealed deficiencies in his infection prevention and control practices. While Dr. Portugal has remedied these deficiencies, the College wishes to ensure that he continues to employ acceptable infection prevention and control practices. Therefore, the College will be conducting unannounced inspections into Dr. Portugal’s practices, approximately every six months for at least two years.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 10 Aug 2010
Summary of Decision:
On August 10, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Portugal has committed an act of professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 1991, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Between June 2007 and June 2009, a patient, through her authorized representative, sent approximately thirteen requests to Dr. Portugal requesting copies of all of his clinical notes and records from 2002 to present. Despite receiving these requests, Dr. Portugal failed to provide Patient A's clinical notes and records to the patient or her authorized representative.

Dr. Portugal stated that the delay in response to the patient s request was as a result of failures by his office to either respond to the requests or bring them to his attention and he has instituted changes in order to avoid similar problems in the future.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. The Registrar suspend Dr. Portugal's certificate of registration for a period of one month, which suspension shall itself be suspended if, within two months of the date of this Order:

i. Dr. Portugal retains the services of a third party organization/efficiency expert (the "TPO") to evaluate his current administrative practices;

ii. Dr. Portugal implements all reasonable recommendations made by the TPO regarding the management and day to day administration of his practice; and

iii. Dr. Portugal provides a letter from the TPO confirming that all reasonable recommendations have been implemented.

2. The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Portugal's certificate of registration:

(a) Dr. Portugal shall provide a report from the TPO twelve months after he implements all of their recommendations, confirming that his organization system remains working and that his practice is running efficiently; and

(b) Dr. Portugal shall successfully complete, at his own expense, the College's Medical Ethics and Informed Consent Course within twelve months of the date of this Order.

3. The terms, conditions and limitations in paragraph 2 herein shall be removed by the College after it receives confirmation that those terms, conditions and limitations have been fulfilled.

4. Dr. Portugal appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

5. Dr. Portugal pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650 within 30 days of the date of this Order.

6. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): August 10, 2010

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 18 Feb 2016
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Francisco Suyat Portugal to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 18, 2016:

An investigation into Dr. Portugal’s practice revealed deficiencies in his infection prevention and control practices. While Dr. Portugal has remedied these deficiencies, the College wishes to ensure that he continues to employ acceptable infection prevention and control practices. Therefore, the College will be conducting unannounced inspections into Dr. Portugal’s practices, approximately every six months for at least two years.

Training

Medical School: Far Eastern University, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 27 Mar 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2002
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 02 Aug 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1979
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 May 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 1979