THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 15:44:13 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Ottawa Heart Institut
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 696-7000
Extension: 15396
Fax: 613-696-7216

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 04 Dec 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 22 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Ottawa Heart Institut
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 696-7000
Extension: 15396
Fax: 613-696-7216

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 04 Dec 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 22 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DUNCAN JOHN STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DUNCAN JOHN STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1979
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 1979