THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:37:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Philippines, 1967
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 06 Dec 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. de Villa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Aug 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO
Medical School: University of the Philippines, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 06 Dec 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. de Villa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Aug 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Philippines, 1967

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 25 Aug 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1979
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2021


DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 1979