THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:35:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 174 Duplex Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5P 2A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 489-0180
Fax: (416) 488-3844

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 24 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lance Levy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Oct 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 174 Duplex Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5P 2A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 489-0180
Fax: (416) 488-3844

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 24 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lance Levy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Oct 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LANCE DAVID LEVY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LANCE DAVID LEVY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 24 Feb 2003
Summary of Decision:
On February 25, 2003, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Levy committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medcine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Committee ordered the following:

i) That the Registrar shall suspend Dr. Levy s certificate of registration for a period of one year commencing on the date of this order;

ii) The Registrar shall suspend four months of this suspension on the condition that Dr. Levy provides confirmation to the College that he has complied with the conditions set out in subparagraphs (iii) to (xii) below;

iii) Dr. Levy will attend before this panel of the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register;

iv) Dr. Levy will provide a formal apologyto the complainant;

v) Dr. Levy will pay to the College $10,000.00, to be held by the College in trust, to guarantee the payment of any amount the College may pay out in respect of LB for funding for therapy and counseling, or in the alternative, Dr. Levy will post a letter of credit in the sum of $10,000.00 for same, so long as it is permitted by law in the circumstances of Dr. Levy s bankruptcy;

vi) Dr. Levy will submit to an assessment of his fitness to practice by a psychiatrist acceptable to the College, and prior to returning to practice at the conclusion of his suspension, Dr. Levy will provide the psychiatrist s report, acceptable to the College, certifying his fitness to practise;

vii) Dr. Levy will attend, at his own expense, the boundaries course offered by the College no later than September 12 and 13, 2003;

viii) Dr. Levy will attend, at his own expense, the records keeping course offered by the College no later than September, 2003;

ix) Dr. Levy will accept an inspection of his practice by a person or persons designated by the College;

x) Dr. Levy will accept supervision or other reasonable terms and conditions that the College might identify through its inspection with respect to his ongoing practice;

xi) Dr. Levy will undertake not to do physical examinations of patients, with the exception of his need to take blood pressures because of medications prescribed, and will co-operate in the College s monitoring of this condition; and

xii) Dr. Levy will pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00, so long as it is permitted by law in the circumstances of Dr. Levy s bankruptcy.

In addition, the Discipline Committee orders and directs that if Dr. Levy fails to comply with sub-paragraphs (iii) to (xii) above, he will serve the remainder of his suspension, and,

The results of this proceeding will be included in the register.

On August 23, 2005, the Discipline Committee heard a motion to vary the order of the Discipline Committee dated May 16, 2003 (above).

The Committee removed the prohibition on Dr. Levy conducting physical examinations.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 24, 2003

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 24 Feb 2003
Summary of Decision:
On February 25, 2003, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Levy committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medcine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Committee ordered the following:

i) That the Registrar shall suspend Dr. Levy s certificate of registration for a period of one year commencing on the date of this order;

ii) The Registrar shall suspend four months of this suspension on the condition that Dr. Levy provides confirmation to the College that he has complied with the conditions set out in subparagraphs (iii) to (xii) below;

iii) Dr. Levy will attend before this panel of the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register;

iv) Dr. Levy will provide a formal apologyto the complainant;

v) Dr. Levy will pay to the College $10,000.00, to be held by the College in trust, to guarantee the payment of any amount the College may pay out in respect of LB for funding for therapy and counseling, or in the alternative, Dr. Levy will post a letter of credit in the sum of $10,000.00 for same, so long as it is permitted by law in the circumstances of Dr. Levy s bankruptcy;

vi) Dr. Levy will submit to an assessment of his fitness to practice by a psychiatrist acceptable to the College, and prior to returning to practice at the conclusion of his suspension, Dr. Levy will provide the psychiatrist s report, acceptable to the College, certifying his fitness to practise;

vii) Dr. Levy will attend, at his own expense, the boundaries course offered by the College no later than September 12 and 13, 2003;

viii) Dr. Levy will attend, at his own expense, the records keeping course offered by the College no later than September, 2003;

ix) Dr. Levy will accept an inspection of his practice by a person or persons designated by the College;

x) Dr. Levy will accept supervision or other reasonable terms and conditions that the College might identify through its inspection with respect to his ongoing practice;

xi) Dr. Levy will undertake not to do physical examinations of patients, with the exception of his need to take blood pressures because of medications prescribed, and will co-operate in the College s monitoring of this condition; and

xii) Dr. Levy will pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00, so long as it is permitted by law in the circumstances of Dr. Levy s bankruptcy.

In addition, the Discipline Committee orders and directs that if Dr. Levy fails to comply with sub-paragraphs (iii) to (xii) above, he will serve the remainder of his suspension, and,

The results of this proceeding will be included in the register.

On August 23, 2005, the Discipline Committee heard a motion to vary the order of the Discipline Committee dated May 16, 2003 (above).

The Committee removed the prohibition on Dr. Levy conducting physical examinations.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 24, 2003

Training

Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 25 Oct 2003
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 25 Feb 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2003

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Feb 2003

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1978