THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:52:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1973
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 16 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 2006 Old Second Line Road, Kanata ON, K2K 1X7
Date Received: 01 Apr 2015

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Room 0350
A/L 0700C
200 Tunney's Pasteur Driveway
Ottawa, Ontario
K1A 0K9
Tel: (613) 957-4667
Fax: (613) 946-0639
Date Received: 06 Jul 2010

Instructions/Address:
Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
PO Box 72060
RPO Kanata North
Kanata, ON
K2K 2P4
Date Received: 13 May 2008

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 16 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 2006 Old Second Line Road, Kanata ON, K2K 1X7
Date Received: 01 Apr 2015

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Room 0350
A/L 0700C
200 Tunney's Pasteur Driveway
Ottawa, Ontario
K1A 0K9
Tel: (613) 957-4667
Fax: (613) 946-0639
Date Received: 06 Jul 2010

Instructions/Address:
Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
PO Box 72060
RPO Kanata North
Kanata, ON
K2K 2P4
Date Received: 13 May 2008

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Apr 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1979
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2015


DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 1979