THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:02:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University Medical Centre
Health Sciences Centre
Room 3U9 (3U 1-9)
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 76645
Fax: (905) 521-5053

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 29 Nov 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University Medical Centre
Health Sciences Centre
Room 3U9 (3U 1-9)
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 76645
Fax: (905) 521-5053

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 29 Nov 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIERAN JOSEPH KILLIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KILLIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIERAN JOSEPH KILLIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KILLIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1979
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 1979